IL HB3652 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, in assisting all students with a college or post-secondary education plan, a school counselor must include a discussion on all post-secondary education options, including 4-year colleges or universities, community colleges, and vocational schools. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SCH COUNSELOR-COLLEGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0290 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.24b | Amended Code | Citation Text |