IL HB3663 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Limited Cooperative Association Act. Authorizes the organization of a limited cooperative association, as an entity distinct from its members, for any lawful purpose, whether or not for profit. Provides that a limited cooperative association may be a collective worker cooperative in which there is only one class of members consisting of worker-members who manage all of the affairs of the limited cooperative association or a worker cooperative or employment cooperative that includes a class of worker-members who are natural persons whose patronage consists of labor contributed to or other work performed for the limited cooperative association. Contains provisions regarding: findings; formation; articles of organization; organization; bylaws; members; community investors; voting; a board of directors; an assembly; dissolution; conversion; and applicability of securities laws. Amends the Co-operative Act and the Illinois Securities Law of 1953 to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LIMITED COOPERATIVE ASSOC ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0292 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-07 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-06 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 310 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |