IL HB3674 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that, in addition to a freeze on a minor's consumer report, a freeze may be placed on the credit file of a minor and specified other persons. Establishes the procedures for obtaining a freeze on the credit file of a minor or protected consumer. Defines terms.
Title
CREDIT FILE FREEZE MINORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2MM | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3674&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3674.htm |