IL HB3711 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Equitable Restrooms Act. Requires every public building with restrooms open and accessible to the public to have at least one safe, sanitary, convenient, and publicly accessible baby diaper changing station that is accessible to women entering a restroom provided for use by women and one that is accessible to men entering a restroom provided for use by men, or at least one such baby diaper changing station that is accessible to both men and women. Provides exceptions to the requirement for: industrial buildings, nightclubs, or bars that do not permit anyone who is under 18 years of age to enter the premises; restrooms located in a health facility, if the restroom is intended for the use of one patient or resident at a time; and renovations, if a local building permitting entity or building inspector determines that the installation of a baby diaper changing station is not feasible or would result in a failure to comply with applicable building standards governing the right of access for persons with disabilities. Requires a public restroom that is open and accessible to the public and includes a baby diaper changing station to include signage at or near the entrance to the baby changing station indicating the location of the baby diaper changing station. Provides that the requirements are not enforceable by a private right of action.
Title
EQUITABLE RESTROOM-BABY CHANGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0293 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 011-001-000 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-003-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 35 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 35 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |