IL HB3816 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority to create a grant program for community groups and organizations working with youth and young adults for violence prevention activities. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
$ICJIA-VIOLENCE PREVENTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3816&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB3816.pdf |