IL HB3849 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that notwithstanding the eligibility requirements regarding expungement, a petitioner is eligible to petition the circuit court to expunge all records that have been sealed 3 years after the petitioner is granted sealing if the petitioner has not been arrested or has not had one or more criminal convictions between the court granting sealing and the filing of the petition for relief.
Title
EXPUNGEMENT ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-06-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |