IL HB3851 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-13)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Reduces the trailer flat weight tax for maximum loads of 3,000 lbs. and less from $118 to $18, if and only if Senate Bill 1939 of the 101st General Assembly becomes law. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-TRAILER WEIGHT TAX

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2020-07-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2020-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2020-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2020-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2020-03-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
2020-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2020-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2020-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
2020-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2020-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2020-02-27HouseTo Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
2020-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
2020-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2020-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2020-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2020-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2020-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
2020-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2020-02-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
2020-02-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2020-02-18HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2020-02-18HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2020-02-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2020-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2020-02-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
2020-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
2020-02-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2020-01-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2020-01-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-10-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2019-09-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy
2019-09-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-08-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-07-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2019-07-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2019-07-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-819Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback