IL HB3863 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Compensation Act. Provides that a member of the General Assembly may, prior to being sworn into office, elect to reject any travel reimbursement provided under the Act. Provides that once a member elects to reject travel reimbursement, he or she shall not be eligible to receive travel reimbursement for current and future terms of office. Provides that any moneys received by a member for purposes of travel reimbursement may be repaid to the State. Amends the Compensation Review Act. Provides that members of the General Assembly and executive branch constitutional officers may, prior to being sworn into office, elect not to receive any increase in compensation that would otherwise apply based on a cost of living adjustment. Provides that once a member of the General Assembly or an executive branch constitutional officer elects not to receive a cost of living adjustment, he or she shall not be eligible to receive a cost of living adjustment for current and future terms of office. Provides that any increase in compensation received as a cost of living adjustment by a member of the General Assembly or an executive branch constitutional officer may be repaid to the State.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-COMPENSATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-08-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 115 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 120 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3863&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3863.htm |