IL HB3875 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on August 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that Juneteenth National Freedom Day shall be observed on June 19 of each year as a holiday throughout the State (currently, not a holiday and is observed on the third Saturday of June of each year). Provides that when June 19 falls on a Sunday, the following Monday shall be held and considered the holiday. Amends the Election Code, the Illinois Procurement Code, the School Code, and the Promissory Note and Bank Holiday Act to include Juneteenth National Freedom Day as a holiday. Effective June 1, 2020.
Title
STATE HOLIDAY-JUNETEENTH
Sponsors
Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Rep. Mark Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-06-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-06-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-08-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 1-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 630 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 15-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 490 | 63 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3875&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3875.htm |