IL HB3878 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-11 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Railroad Intoxicating Liquor Act.
Title
RAILROAD LIQUOR ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-11 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-003-002 |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 009-002-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-08-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
610 | 90 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |