IL HB3883 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on September 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Flavored Tobacco Ban Act. Prohibits the sale or distribution by an establishment of any flavored tobacco product. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall enforce the Act and may adopt rules or guidelines for the implementation and enforcement of the Act. Amends the Tobacco Products Tax Act of 1995. Permits the Department of Revenue to suspend the license of any distributor that violates the Flavored Tobacco Ban Act.
Title
FLAVORED TOBACCO BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-10-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-10-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-09-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-09-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-09-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-09-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-09-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2019-09-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-09-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-09-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 143 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |