IL HB3884 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-09 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that "race", as used in the Employment and Elementary, Secondary, and Higher Education Articles, includes traits historically associated with races, including, but not limited to, hair texture and protective hairstyles such as braids, locks, and twists.
Title
HUMAN RTS-DISCRIMINATION-RACE
Sponsors
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] |
Rep. Justin Slaughter [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-07-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-09-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 1-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |