IL HB3890 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-17 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Use Tax Act and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the term "selling price" does not include the value of or credit given for traded-in tangible personal property (currently, beginning on January 1, 2020, with respect to motor vehicles, "selling price" does include the trade-in value). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

USE/OCC-TRADE-IN VALUE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-17HouseFirst Reading
2019-10-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-09-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-09-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-09-30HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-09-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-09-17HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351052Amended CodeCitation Text
351201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback