IL HB3892 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act. Provides that one hour of public or community service shall be equivalent to the value of one hour of work at the State minimum wage or the minimum hourly wage in the municipality where the defendant resides, whichever is greater, as calculated by the Department of Labor (rather than one hour of public or community service being equivalent to $4 of assessment). Provides that on the effective date of the Act and annually thereafter, the Director of Labor shall publish the Illinois minimum wage and the minimum wages of each municipality in the State that has enacted a minimum wage that is greater than the State minimum wage. Provides that the Director of Labor shall update the list if the State or municipal minimum wage is changed by law or if a municipality enacts an ordinance increasing its minimum wage that is greater than the State minimum wage. Provides that the published minimum wage list and updates shall be sent to the Administrative Office of the Illinois Courts to be provided to each judicial circuit in the State.
Title
CRIM&TRAFFIC ASSESSMENT
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Jawaharial Williams [D] |
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-036-000 |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 011-007-000 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-09-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 135 | 5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |