IL HB3897 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that a student whose 22nd birthday occurs during the school year is eligible for special education services through the end of the school year (rather than being eligible for services only until the day before his or her 22nd birthday). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-MAXIMUM AGE
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-11-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-09-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-1.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3897&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3897.htm |