IL HB3917 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the evidence-based funding provisions of the School Code. Provides that funds received by the Chicago school district for low-income, English learner, and special education resources must be distributed to every school of the district in the appropriate amount specified under the Essential Elements component of the funding formula. Makes technical changes having a revisory function. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
SCH CD-EVIDENCE-BASED FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2019-11-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-10-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-10-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-10-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 27, 2019 |
2019-10-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2019-10-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-10 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-10-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3917&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3917.htm |