IL HB3918 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Minimum Wage Law. In a provision concerning an employer's liability for unpaid wages, provides that the Department of Labor shall, by rule, devise an administrative process by which any fine levied against the employer may be reduced upon a showing by the employer that the employer: (i) had not previously committed a violation of the Minimum Wage Law; and (ii) had not acted willfully, wantonly, or recklessly. Effective immediately.
Title
MINIMUM WAGE-UNDERPAYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Tabled |
2020-02-18 | House | Motion Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2019-10-23 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-10-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-17 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 105 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3918&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3918.htm |