IL HB3928 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Critical Health Problems and Comprehensive Health Education Act. Adds e-cigarettes and other vapor devices as one of the educational areas the Comprehensive Health Education Program must include. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH ED-E-CIGARETTES
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] |
Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2020-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-12-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-23 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joyce Mason |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 110 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |