IL HB3932 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Missing and Murdered Chicago Women Act. Creates the Task Force on Missing and Murdered Chicago Women. Provides for the composition of the Task Force and its appointment and meetings. Provides that the Task Force must examine and report on the following: (1) the systemic causes behind violence that Chicago women and girls experience, including patterns and underlying factors that explain why disproportionately high levels of violence occur against Chicago women and girls, including underlying historical, social, economic, institutional, and cultural factors that may contribute to the violence; (2) appropriate methods for tracking and collecting data on violence against Chicago women and girls, including data on missing and murdered Chicago women and girls; (3) policies and institutions such as policing, child welfare, medical examiner practices, and other governmental practices that impact violence against Chicago women and girls and the investigation and prosecution of crimes of gender-related violence against Chicago residents; (4) measures necessary to address and reduce violence against Chicago women and girls; and (5) measures to help victims, victims' families, and victims' communities prevent and heal from violence that occurs against Chicago women and girls. Provides that the Task Force shall report annually to the General Assembly and the Governor on the work of the Task Force.
Title
MISSING&MURDERED CHICAGO WOMEN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-01-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |