IL HB3934 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that a cyber attack is a "disaster". Requires the Governor to delegate or assign authority to the Director of the Illinois Emergency Management Agency to manage, coordinate, and direct all resources by orders issued at the time of a disaster. Effective immediately.
Title
IEMA-DISASTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-28 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |