IL HB3967 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Healthcare and Family Services Law. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall approve veteran support specialists who are certified by, and in good standing with, the Illinois Alcohol and Other Drug Abuse Professional Certification Association, Inc. to provide peer support services to recipients of medical assistance under Article V of the Illinois Public Aid Code.
Title
DHFS-VETERAN SUPPORT SPECIALST
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] | Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
Sen. Andrew Chesney [R] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-11-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3967&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3967.htm |