IL HB3980 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides for registration under the Act of a person convicted of a battery if: (1) the State's Attorney filed a notice contemporaneous with or included in the summons, complaint, or other document charging the battery to seek sex offender registration under the provision as a sexually motivated battery; (2) the complaining witness is under 17 years of age; (3) the offender is 21 years of age or older; and (4) the court finds that the battery was "sexually motivated" as defined in the Sex Offender Management Board Act.
Title
SEX OFFENDER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-01-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-01-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Connor |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2020-01-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-01-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-01-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2020-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-01-17 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jim Durkin |
2020-01-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2020-01-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-01-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2020-01-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-01-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2020-01-15 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-01-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-01-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2020-01-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-01-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-01-08 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-01-08 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-01-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-01-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2020-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-12-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 150 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3980&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3980.htm |