IL HB3984 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates certain amounts from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for family and community services and related distributive purposes , including federal funds that are made available for grants and expenses associated with Parents Too Soon and the Healthy Families Program . Effective immediately.
Title
$DHS-FAMILY SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-01-29 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-01-29 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-01-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-12-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3984&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB3984.pdf |