IL HB3987 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that notwithstanding anything to the contrary, certain provisions of the Electric Service Customer Choice and Rate Relief Law of 1997 relating to the recovery of costs associated with the purchase of zero emission credits do not apply to any retail customers of an electric utility that serves more than 3,000,000 retail customers in the State. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITY EMISSION CREDIT LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-12-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-12-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-12-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-12-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-12-13 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-12-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-12-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2019-12-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-12-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-12-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-12-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3987&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3987.htm |