IL HB3992 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act to prohibit the Board of Higher Education from awarding any grant funds to a private institution of higher education that is operated for profit. Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act to remove a for-profit educational organization from the definition of "institution of higher learning", "qualified institution", and "institution". Removes a provision allowing Monetary Award Program grants to be made to applicants enrolled at qualified for-profit institutions. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-FOR PROFIT-NO GRANTS
Sponsors
Rep. Maurice West [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 9.39 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 947 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 947 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3992&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3992.htm |