IL HB4056 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the chairperson of the county board or the president or chairperson of the board of county commissioners may ask the State's Attorney to request a written opinion from the Attorney General relating to the official duties of the county board or board of county commissioners and the Attorney General may, when appropriate, furnish a written opinion in response to the request from the State's Attorney. Allows the president or chairperson, after approval of a majority of members on the county board or board of county commissioners, to request a written opinion directly from the Attorney General if the State's Attorney has not requested a written opinion within 30 days after a president's or chairperson's request to the State's Attorney. Amends the Attorney General Act making conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-AG WRITTEN OPINION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 013-002-000 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 205 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1186 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4056&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4056.htm |