IL HB4064 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-2)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Higher Education Fair Admissions Act. Provides that a public institution of higher education may not require applicants to submit standardized college admissions test scores to the institution as a part of the admissions process. Provides that the submission of standardized test scores to the institution shall be at the option of the applicant. Requires the adoption of a policy. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED ADMISSION-NO TESTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-02-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-18 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-02-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-01-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-29 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-01-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |