IL HB4068 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Homeowners' Energy Policy Statement Act. Provides that the entity granted such power in a deed restriction may determine the specific location where a solar energy system may be installed on the roof if the determination does not reduce the production or productivity of the solar energy system by more than 5% (rather than within an orientation to the south or with 45 degrees east or west of due south provided that the determination does not impair the effective operation of the solar energy system). Defines "production" and "productivity". Provides that the application for approval to install or use a solar energy system shall be processed within 60 days of (rather than 90 days after) the submission of the application. Deletes language providing that if an application is submitted before an energy policy statement is adopted by an association, the 90-day period shall not begin to run until the date that the policy is adopted.
Title
DEED RESTRICTIONS-SOLAR PANELS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-01-31 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
765 | 165 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
765 | 165 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4068&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4068.htm |