IL HB4079 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Public Act 86-729, which transferred specified property to Kane County for criminal courts complex use. Provides that the property may also be used for a private drug addiction treatment center. Amends the Counties Code. Allows the operation of a private drug addiction treatment center on the property transferred to Kane County in Public Act 86-729. Provides that Kane County may lease portions of the property transferred to Kane County to a not-for-profit or for-profit company for a drug addiction treatment center and share in the drug addiction treatment center revenue. Provides that Kane County may authorize the expenditure of funds for a private drug addiction treatment center on the property transferred to the County. Effective immediately.
Title
KANE CO-DRUG TREATMENT CENTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-01-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4079&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4079.htm |