IL HB4135 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Library District Cannabis Retailers' Occupation Tax Law in the Public Library District Act of 1991. Provides that, on and after January 1, 2021, the corporate authorities of a library district may, by ordinance, impose a 1% tax upon all persons engaged in the business of selling cannabis, other than cannabis purchased under the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act, at retail in the library district on the gross receipts from these sales made in the course of that business. Amends the County Cannabis Retailers' Occupation Tax Law of the Counties Code. Reduces the tax rate the corporate authorities of a county may impose by 1% within a library district if the library district imposes a Library District Cannabis Retailers' Occupation Tax. Effective immediately.
Title
LIBRARY DIST-CANNABIS REVENUE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-1006.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
75 | 16 | 35-45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4135&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4135.htm |