IL HB4138 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Phase Out Corporate Giveaways Interstate Compact. Enters into the compact, which may be entered into by any state and the District of Columbia, in which each member state agrees not to offer or provide any company-specific tax incentive or company-specific grant to any entity for a corporate headquarters, manufacturing facility, office space, or other real estate development located in any other member state as an inducement for the corporate headquarters, manufacturing facility, office space, or other real estate development to relocate to the offering member state. Defines terms. Excludes: (1) workforce development grants that train employees; (2) company-specific tax incentives or company-specific grants from local governments; and (3) specified company-specific tax incentives or company-specific grants related to companies already within the member state. Creates the Phase Out Corporate Giveaways Board and provides for membership and meeting requirements. Provides for withdrawal of a member state with a 6-month written notice to each member state's chief executive officer. Contains construction and severability provisions.
Title
CORPORATE GIVEAWAYS COMPACT
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Joyce Mason [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-02-05 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-01-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4138&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4138.htm |