IL HB4143 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes changes in provisions prohibiting certain unfunded State mandates. Provides that a school district or private school may discontinue or modify the mandate if (i) a separate State appropriation does not fully fund the mandate or (ii) the mandate does not improve the educational outcomes of the school district or private school. Requires a school board to notify the regional superintendent of schools of its decision to discontinue or modify the mandate. Requires the regional superintendent to approve the discontinuation or modification unless he or she demonstrates that (i) the costs imposed by the mandate are fully funded by a separate State appropriation or (ii) the mandated activity improves the educational outcomes of the school district. Makes other changes. Effectively immediately.
Title
SCH CD-UNFUNDED MANDATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-02-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 22-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4143&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4143.htm |