IL HB4152 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that, subject to federal law and regulation, no provider of telephone, cellular telephone, television, Internet, energy, or water service shall impose a fee for termination or early cancellation of a service contract if the customer dies before the end of the contract. Provides that every violation is an unlawful practice punishable by a civil penalty not to exceed $1,000.
Title
EARLY CANCELLATION FEES-DEATH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 028-000-000 |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-02-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |