IL HB4171 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides that no fee shall be required if the records sought to be expunged or sealed were arrests resulting in release without charging or arrests or charges not initiated by arrest resulting in acquittal, dismissal, or conviction when the conviction was reversed or vacated, except for the expungement or sealing of certain records of minor traffic violations. Eliminates the county fee waiver pilot program that was only applicable in counties of 3,000,000 or more inhabitants that was set to expire on January 1, 2021.
Title
CRIM ID-EXPUNGEMENT FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 014-004-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-02-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-01-30 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-01-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-01-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4171&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4171.htm |