IL HB4245 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral Act. Provides that, from January 4, 2021 through March 1, 2021, taxpayers may apply for a loan up to the amount of $15,000 to pay all or a part of real estate taxes payable and due from preceding years. Effective immediately.
Title
SENIOR TAX DEFERRAL-LOANS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4245&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4245.htm |