IL HB4249 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that a 10-year limitation period for actions arising out of specified criminal acts is applicable to causes of action accruing on or after July 1, 2009.
Title
CIV PRO-PERSONAL ACTIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 012-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2020-02-11 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 13-214.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4249&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4249.htm |