IL HB4251 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Descent and Distribution Article of the Probate Act of 1975. Creates Pam's Law. Provides that a person who intentionally and unjustifiably causes the death of another is disqualified from being: (1) a personal representative of the decedent; (2) the executor or administrator of the decedent's estate; and (3) the person who has the right to determine the method for disposing of the body. Provides that in any case in which a preponderance of the evidence shows that the surviving spouse or next of kin caused the death of another, the court may disqualify the spouse or next of kin on an interim basis and appoint a special administrator for the limited purpose of investigating, presenting, and proving a claim. Provides that the Act applies retroactively to any death caused by intentional and unjustifiable means that is still subject to prosecution under any applicable criminal statute of limitations.
Title
PROBATE-PERSON CAUSING DEATH
Sponsors
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Rep. Curtis Tarver [D] | Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] |
Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000 |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2020-03-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-000-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | To Family Law Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4251&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4251.htm |