IL HB4255 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that a qualified school that accepts scholarship students must comply with: all provisions of federal and State laws and rules applicable to public schools pertaining to special education and the instruction of English learners and certain provisions of the School Code concerning charter schools; provisions of the Illinois Humans Rights Act; and specific provisions of the School Code. Effective Immediately.
Title
INVEST KIDS-QUALIFIED SCHOOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 40 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4255&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4255.htm |