IL HB4260 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts to make changes concerning references to specified racial and ethnic groups.
Title
ETHNIC GROUP TERMINOLOGY
Sponsors
Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 205 | 9.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 925 | 3.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 930 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 947 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 947 | 65.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 105 | 3.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 55.62 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 500-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 575 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 577 | 35-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 785 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 4-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 410 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 410 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 11-212 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 210 | 23.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-10.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4260&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4260.htm |