IL HB4275 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Healthcare and Family Services Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to designate one or more health care telementoring entities based on an application to be developed by the Department. Allows approved applicants from Illinois to be eligible for State funding in accordance with rules developed by the Department. Provides that funding shall be provided based on the number of physicians who are assisted by each approved health care telementoring entity and the hours of assistance provided to each physician. Defines "health care telementoring".
Title
DHFS-HEALTH CARE TELEMENTORING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4275&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4275.htm |