IL HB4279 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Financially Distressed City Law of the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that if a financially distressed city or the city's Financial Advisory Authority is awarded a State grant, any moneys the financially distressed city or Authority would be required to match under the grant are waived unless the moneys under the grant come from federal moneys that require the match. Provides that the entity awarding a State grant shall not consider a municipality's status as a financially distressed city in awarding a State grant. Effective immediately.
Title
GRANTS TO DISTRESSED CITIES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4279&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4279.htm |