IL HB4289 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, if the amount of the credit for residential real property taxes exceeds the taxpayer's liability, that amount shall be refunded if the taxpayer is 65 years or older and has a federal adjusted gross income of not more than $50,000. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provision. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-PROP TX CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2020-02-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4289&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4289.htm |