IL HB4292 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employment Article of the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that "citizenship status" includes, among other things, the status of being a person who is authorized by the federal government to work in the United States. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for an employer, for purposes of complying with federal employment eligibility requirements, to refuse to honor work authorization based upon the specific status or term of status that accompanies the authorization to work. Effective immediately.
Title
CIV RIGHTS-WORK AUTHORIZATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-02-04 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4292&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4292.htm |