IL HB4377 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Repeals provisions that prohibit a person that is serving a sentence of confinement in any penal institution from voting until his or her release from confinement. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
ELEC CODE-INCARCERATED BAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 3-5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4377&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4377.htm |