IL HB4418 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Requires the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the Department of Innovation and Technology, to study and evaluate the use of blockchain technology to protect voter records and election results with the assistance of specified experts. Requires the Board to submit a report on the use of blockchain technology to the Governor and General Assembly. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2023.
Title
ELECT CD-BLOCKCHAIN TECHNOLOGY
Sponsors
Sen. John Connor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Connor |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4418&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4418.htm |