IL HB4427 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a municipality reporting Tax Increment Financing information shall additionally report to the Comptroller: (1) the number of jobs, aspirational or otherwise, if any, projected to be created for each redevelopment project area at the time of approval of the redevelopment agreement; (2) the number of jobs, if any, created as a result of the development under the same guidelines and assumptions as was used for the projections used at the time of approval of the redevelopment agreement to date for that reporting period; (3) the amount of increment projected to be created at the time of approval of the redevelopment agreement for each redevelopment project area; (4) the amount of increment created as a result of the development to date for that reporting period using the same assumptions as was used for the projections used at the time of approval of the redevelopment agreement; and (5) the stated rate of return identified by the developer to the municipality for each redevelopment project area, if any. In provisions requiring a municipality to report an analysis prepared by a financial advisor or underwriter, provides that the advisor or underwriter shall be chosen by the municipality and that analysis shall additionally include actual debt service.
Title
MUNICIPAL CODE-TIF REPORTING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.6-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-8-3.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4427&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4427.htm |