IL HB4433 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act. Provides that if a health services plan corporation furnishes dental services to the plan's subscribers and beneficiaries and these services are rendered by dentists licensed in Illinois, the board of trustees of the corporation shall appoint a Dental Director who shall be a dentist licensed to practice dentistry in Illinois. Provides that the Dental Director, under the board of trustees, shall have control of and responsibility for the dental and dental-related scientific aspects of the business of the corporation. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTH SERVICES PLAN-DENTAL
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 165 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4433&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4433.htm |