IL HB4447 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act and the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that a renewal application shall be accepted by the Illinois State Police if submitted within 180 days before the expiration of the applicant's Firearm Owner's Identification Card or concealed carry license. Provides that submission of a renewal application within that 180-day period shall not affect the expiration date of the applicant's Firearm Owner's Identification Card or concealed carry license.
Title
FOID&CON CARRY-RENEWALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4447&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4447.htm |