IL HB4448 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act and the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that if a Firearm Owner's Identification Card of a licensee under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act expires during the term of a concealed carry license, the Firearm Owner's Identification Card and the license remain valid and the licensee does not have to renew his or her Firearm Owner's Identification Card. Provides that the Illinois State Police shall automatically renew the licensee's Firearm Owner's Identification Card and send a renewed Firearm Owner's Identification Card to the licensee unless the Illinois State Police has reason to believe the person is no longer eligible for the Card.
Title
CONCEAL CARRY-AUTO RENEW FOID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2020-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4448&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4448.htm |