IL HB4454 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that each officer, member, and employee must complete, at least annually, a diversity, inclusion, and cultural competence training program. Provides for the contents of the training program. Provides that proof of completion must be submitted to the applicable ethics officer. Provides that the training program shall be overseen by the appropriate Ethics Commission and Inspector General. Requires each ultimate jurisdictional authority to submit a report summarizing the training program with specified content. Requires governmental units to adopt an ordinance or resolution establishing a policy of diversity, inclusion, and cultural competence training.
Title
ETHICS-DIVERSITY TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2020-09-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2020-09-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-08-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-08-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2020-08-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-10.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 430 | 70-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4454&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4454.htm |